House | 04/08/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (38-7) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {733526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |