Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {403921/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Hearing 4/10 at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Rereferred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {853523/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2023
|
First Reading Senate Rules
|
|
|