Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Hearing 4/06 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {963323/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |