House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (29-16) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Floor Amendment {883520/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-27) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Floor Amendment {643323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-27) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {313629/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {313629/1 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/20/2022 | Pre-filed |