House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (39-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters |