Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB102 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/08/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0102*  
  
HOUSE BILL 102 
R5   	4lr1165 
HB 1207/23 – ENT 	(PRE–FILED) 	CF SB 730 
By: Delegate Miller 
Requested: October 25, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 8, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Motor Vehicles – Motorcycles – Passenger Restrictions 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring a rear passenger on a motorcycle to be able to firmly position 3 
the passenger’s feet on the footrests of the motorcycle, subject to a certain exception; 4 
and generally relating to passenger restrictions for motorcycles. 5 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 
 Article – Transportation 7 
Section 21–1302 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – Transportation 13 
 
21–1302. 14 
 
 (a) The operator of a motorcycle may ride the motorcycle only on the permanent 15 
and regular seat attached to it. 16 
 
 (b) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any other person unless the 17 
motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event a passenger may ride 18  2 	HOUSE BILL 102  
 
 
on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for two persons, or on another seat firmly 1 
attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. 2 
 
 (c) (1) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride on a 3 
motorcycle unless the motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event 4 
a passenger may ride on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for [2] TWO persons, 5 
or on another seat firmly attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. 6 
 
 (2) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 7 
PARAGRAPH , A PASSENGER MAY NOT RIDE ON A MOTORCYCLE ON A SE AT AT THE 8 
REAR OF THE OPERATOR UNLESS THE PASSENGER IS ABLE TO POSITION THE 9 
PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS WHILE SEAT ED. 10 
 
 (II) SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH DO ES NOT APPLY 11 
TO A PASSENGER ON A MOTORCYCLE WHO IS UNABLE TO POSITION THE 12 
PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS DUE TO A P ERMANENT PHYSICAL 13 
DISABILITY. 14 
 
 (d) A person may ride on a motorcycle operated under a Class M driver’s license 15 
only while sitting astride the seat, facing forward, with one leg on each side of the 16 
motorcycle. 17 
 
 (e) A person may not operate a motorcycle while carrying any package, bundle, 18 
or other article that prevents the person from keeping both hands on the steering 19 
mechanism. 20 
 
 (f) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any person in a position that 21 
interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. 22 
 
 (g) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride in a position 23 
that interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. 24 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 
October 1, 2024. 26 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.