Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 637 | |
2 | 1 | ||
3 | - | – 1 – | |
4 | - | Chapter 637 | |
5 | - | (House Bill 102) | |
6 | 2 | ||
7 | - | AN ACT concerning | |
3 | + | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | + | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | + | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | + | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | + | amendment. | |
8 | + | *hb0102* | |
8 | 9 | ||
9 | - | Motor Vehicles – Motorcycles – Passenger Restrictions | |
10 | + | HOUSE BILL 102 | |
11 | + | R5 4lr1165 | |
12 | + | HB 1207/23 – ENT (PRE–FILED) CF SB 730 | |
13 | + | By: Delegate Miller | |
14 | + | Requested: October 25, 2023 | |
15 | + | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
16 | + | Assigned to: Environment and Transportation | |
17 | + | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | + | House action: Adopted | |
19 | + | Read second time: February 8, 2024 | |
10 | 20 | ||
11 | - | FOR the purpose of requiring a rear passenger on a motorcycle to be able to firmly position | |
12 | - | the passenger’s feet on the footrests of the motorcycle, subject to a certain exception; | |
13 | - | and generally relating to passenger restrictions for motorcycles. | |
21 | + | CHAPTER ______ | |
14 | 22 | ||
15 | - | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, | |
16 | - | Article – Transportation | |
17 | - | Section 21–1302 | |
18 | - | Annotated Code of Maryland | |
19 | - | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) | |
23 | + | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
20 | 24 | ||
21 | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, | |
22 | - | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: | |
25 | + | Motor Vehicles – Motorcycles – Passenger Restrictions 2 | |
23 | 26 | ||
24 | - | Article – Transportation | |
27 | + | FOR the purpose of requiring a rear passenger on a motorcycle to be able to firmly position 3 | |
28 | + | the passenger’s feet on the footrests of the motorcycle, subject to a certain exception; 4 | |
29 | + | and generally relating to passenger restrictions for motorcycles. 5 | |
25 | 30 | ||
26 | - | 21–1302. | |
31 | + | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 | |
32 | + | Article – Transportation 7 | |
33 | + | Section 21–1302 8 | |
34 | + | Annotated Code of Maryland 9 | |
35 | + | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 | |
27 | 36 | ||
28 | - | | |
29 | - | ||
37 | + | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 | |
38 | + | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 | |
30 | 39 | ||
31 | - | (b) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any other person unless the | |
32 | - | motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event a passenger may ride | |
33 | - | on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for two persons, or on another seat firmly | |
34 | - | attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. | |
40 | + | Article – Transportation 13 | |
35 | 41 | ||
36 | - | (c) (1) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride on a | |
37 | - | motorcycle unless the motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event | |
38 | - | a passenger may ride on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for [2] TWO persons, | |
39 | - | or on another seat firmly attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. | |
42 | + | 21–1302. 14 | |
40 | 43 | ||
41 | - | (2) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS | |
42 | - | PARAGRAPH , A PASSENGER MAY NOT RIDE ON A MOTORCYCLE ON A SEAT AT THE | |
43 | - | REAR OF THE OPERATOR UNLESS THE PASSENGER IS ABLE TO POSITION THE | |
44 | - | PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS WHILE SEAT ED. | |
44 | + | (a) The operator of a motorcycle may ride the motorcycle only on the permanent 15 | |
45 | + | and regular seat attached to it. 16 | |
45 | 46 | ||
46 | - | (II) SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH DO ES NOT APPLY | |
47 | - | TO A PASSENGER ON A MOTORCYCLE WHO IS UN ABLE TO POSITION THE | |
48 | - | PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS DUE TO A P ERMANENT PH YSICAL Ch. 637 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND | |
47 | + | (b) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any other person unless the 17 | |
48 | + | motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event a passenger may ride 18 2 HOUSE BILL 102 | |
49 | 49 | ||
50 | - | – 2 – | |
51 | - | DISABILITY. | |
52 | 50 | ||
53 | - | (d) A person may ride on a motorcycle operated under a Class M driver’s license | |
54 | - | only while sitting astride the seat, facing forward, with one leg on each side of the | |
55 | - | motorcycle. | |
51 | + | on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for two persons, or on another seat firmly 1 | |
52 | + | attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. 2 | |
56 | 53 | ||
57 | - | (e) A person may not operate a motorcycle while carrying any package, bundle, | |
58 | - | or other article that prevents the person from keeping both hands on the steering | |
59 | - | mechanism. | |
54 | + | (c) (1) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride on a 3 | |
55 | + | motorcycle unless the motorcycle is designed to carry more than one person, in which event 4 | |
56 | + | a passenger may ride on the permanent and regular seat, if designed for [2] TWO persons, 5 | |
57 | + | or on another seat firmly attached to the motorcycle at the rear or side of the operator. 6 | |
60 | 58 | ||
61 | - | (f) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any person in a position that | |
62 | - | interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. | |
59 | + | (2) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 7 | |
60 | + | PARAGRAPH , A PASSENGER MAY NOT RIDE ON A MOTORCYCLE ON A SE AT AT THE 8 | |
61 | + | REAR OF THE OPERATOR UNLESS THE PASSENGER IS ABLE TO POSITION THE 9 | |
62 | + | PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS WHILE SEAT ED. 10 | |
63 | 63 | ||
64 | - | (g) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride in a position | |
65 | - | that interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. | |
64 | + | (II) SUBPARAGRAPH (I) OF THIS PARAGRAPH DO ES NOT APPLY 11 | |
65 | + | TO A PASSENGER ON A MOTORCYCLE WHO IS UNABLE TO POSITION THE 12 | |
66 | + | PASSENGER’S FEET FIRMLY ON THE FOOTRESTS DUE TO A P ERMANENT PHYSICAL 13 | |
67 | + | DISABILITY. 14 | |
66 | 68 | ||
67 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect | |
68 | - | October 1, 2024. | |
69 | + | (d) A person may ride on a motorcycle operated under a Class M driver’s license 15 | |
70 | + | only while sitting astride the seat, facing forward, with one leg on each side of the 16 | |
71 | + | motorcycle. 17 | |
69 | 72 | ||
70 | - | Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024. | |
73 | + | (e) A person may not operate a motorcycle while carrying any package, bundle, 18 | |
74 | + | or other article that prevents the person from keeping both hands on the steering 19 | |
75 | + | mechanism. 20 | |
76 | + | ||
77 | + | (f) The operator of a motorcycle may not carry any person in a position that 21 | |
78 | + | interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. 22 | |
79 | + | ||
80 | + | (g) A person other than the operator of a motorcycle may not ride in a position 23 | |
81 | + | that interferes with the operation or control of the motorcycle or the view of the operator. 24 | |
82 | + | ||
83 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 | |
84 | + | October 1, 2024. 26 | |
85 | + | ||
86 | + | ||
87 | + | ||
88 | + | Approved: | |
89 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
90 | + | Governor. | |
91 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
92 | + | Speaker of the House of Delegates. | |
93 | + | ________________________________________________________________________________ | |
94 | + | President of the Senate. |