House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reassigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |