House | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Floor Amendment {113521/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (28-89) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |