House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923426/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/10/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Judiciary |