Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1043 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/07/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1043*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1043 
J5, J1   	4lr0688 
    	CF SB 945 
By: Delegate Cullison 
Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2024 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance โ€“ Individuals With 2 
Intellectual Disabilities โ€“ Study 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland 4 
Insurance Administration jointly to conduct a study of Maryland Medical Assistance 5 
Program and commercial health insurance coverage to measure the number and 6 
percentage of individuals who have been denied health coverage for the treatment of 7 
an intellectual disability during a certain period of time; and generally relating to a 8 
study of health coverage for individuals with intellectual disabilities.  9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That: 11 
 
 (a) The Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Insurance 12 
Administration jointly shall conduct a study of Maryland Medical Assistance Program and 13 
commercial health insurance coverage to measure the number and percentage of 14 
individuals who have been denied health coverage for the treatment of an intellectual 15 
disability from July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, both inclusive. 16 
 
 (b) On or before December 1, 2025, the Maryland Department of Health and the 17 
Maryland Insurance Administration jointly shall report their findings to the Governor and, 18 
in accordance with ยง 2โ€“1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly.  19 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 20 
1, 2024. 21