Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1060 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- WES MOORE, Governor Ch. 988
21
3-– 1 –
4-Chapter 988
5-(House Bill 1060)
62
7-AN ACT concerning
3+EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
4+ [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
5+ Underlining indicates amendments to bill.
6+ Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by
7+amendment.
8+ *hb1060*
89
9-Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary
10+HOUSE BILL 1060
11+D2 4lr2207
12+ CF SB 965
13+By: Carroll County Delegation
14+Introduced and read first time: February 7, 2024
15+Assigned to: Judiciary
16+Committee Report: Favorable with amendments
17+House action: Adopted
18+Read second time: March 3, 2024
1019
11-FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal
12-to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest
13-available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan
14-beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of
15-the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to
16-the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County.
20+CHAPTER ______
1721
18-BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments,
19- Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings
20-Section 2–320(a)
21- Annotated Code of Maryland
22- (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)
22+AN ACT concerning 1
2323
24-BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments,
25- Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings
26-Section 2–320(b)
27- Annotated Code of Maryland
28- (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement)
24+Carroll County – Sheriff – Salary 2
2925
30- SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND,
31-That the Laws of Maryland read as follows:
26+FOR the purpose of altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be equal 3
27+to the salary of a Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest 4
28+available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan 5
29+beginning in a certain year; providing for a certain change in the annual salary of 6
30+the Sheriff of Carroll County under certain circumstances; and generally relating to 7
31+the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County. 8
3232
33-Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings
33+BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 9
34+ Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 10
35+Section 2–320(a) 11
36+ Annotated Code of Maryland 12
37+ (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 13
3438
35-2–320.
39+BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 14
40+ Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 15
41+Section 2–320(b) 16
42+ Annotated Code of Maryland 17
43+ (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 18
3644
37- (a) This section applies only in Carroll County.
45+ SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 19
46+That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 20
3847
39- (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[:
48+Article – Courts and Judicial Proceedings 21 2 HOUSE BILL 1060
4049
41- (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019;
4250
43- (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and
4451
45- (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter].
52+2–320. 1
4653
47- (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE
48-EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT Ch. 988 2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND
54+ (a) This section applies only in Carroll County. 2
4955
50-– 2 –
51-COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E
52-DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFO RE THE DAY
53-THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NE W TERM OF OFFICE $191,078.10.
56+ (b) (1) The Sheriff of Carroll County shall receive an annual salary of[: 3
5457
55- (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE
56-SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE L ESSER OF:
58+ (1) $110,000 beginning December 3, 2019; 4
5759
58- (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE
59-LIEUTENANT COLONEL , AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT
60-COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY
61-BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YE AR; OR
60+ (2) $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022; and 5
6261
63- (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY
64-BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE 2027, THE
65-SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE $212,309.
62+ (3)] $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023[, and thereafter]. 6
6663
67- (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF
68-STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT
69-APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT
70-AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWIN G TERM OF OFFICE .
64+ (2) BEGINNING IN 2026, THE SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE 7
65+EQUAL TO THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE LIEUTENANT 8
66+COLONEL, AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT COLONEL AT TH E 9
67+DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY BEFO RE THE DAY 10
68+THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS THE NE W TERM OF OFFICE $191,078.10. 11
7169
72- SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article
73-III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to
74-the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office
75-beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the
76-salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of
77-the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed
78-or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term.
70+ (3) BEGINNING IN 2030 AND EVERY 4 YEARS THEREAFTER , THE 12
71+SALARY OF THE SHERIFF OF CARROLL COUNTY SHALL BE THE L ESSER OF: 13
7972
80- SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect
81-October 1, 2024.
73+ (I) THE SALARY OF A DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE 14
74+LIEUTENANT COLONEL , AT THE HIGHEST AVAIL ABLE STEP FOR A LIEU TENANT 15
75+COLONEL AT THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE PAY PLAN IN EF FECT ON THE DAY 16
76+BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A TERM OF OFFICE IN THAT YE AR; OR 17
8277
83-Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2024.
78+ (II) A 110% OF THE SALARY OF THE SHERIFF ON THE DAY 18
79+BEFORE THE DAY THAT THE SHERIFF BEGINS A NEW TERM OF OFFICE 2027, THE 19
80+SALARY FOR THE SHERIFF SHALL BE $212,309. 20
81+
82+ (4) ANY CHANGE IN THE SAL ARY PAID UNDER THE DEPARTMENT OF 21
83+STATE POLICE PAY PLAN DURIN G THE TERM OF OFFICE OF THE SHERIFF MAY NOT 22
84+APPLY TO THE INCUMBE NT SHERIFF, BUT THE CHANGED RATE SHALL TAKE EFFECT 23
85+AT THE BEGINNING OF THE NEXT FOLLOWIN G TERM OF OFFICE . 24
86+
87+ SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, in accordance with Article 25
88+III, § 35 of the Maryland Constitution, this Act may not be construed to extend or apply to 26
89+the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a term of office 27
90+beginning before the effective date of this Act, but the provisions of this Act concerning the 28
91+salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County shall take effect at the beginning of 29
92+the next following term of office. This limitation does not apply to an individual appointed 30
93+or elected after the effective date of this Act to fill out an unexpired term. 31
94+ HOUSE BILL 1060 3
95+
96+
97+ SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1
98+October 1, 2024. 2
99+
100+
101+
102+
103+
104+Approved:
105+________________________________________________________________________________
106+ Governor.
107+________________________________________________________________________________
108+ Speaker of the House of Delegates.
109+________________________________________________________________________________
110+ President of the Senate.