House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |