Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-39) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Pre-filed |