House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 889 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (127-7) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |