House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 800 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {283821/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |