House
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {183429/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {853729/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|