House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (30-11)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {183322/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Floor Amendment {783921/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (36-99)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {843423/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|