House | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Pre-filed |