House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {823524/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judiciary | ||
House | 09/11/2023 | Pre-filed |