House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 885 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {813427/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (128-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |