House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Floor Amendment {413926/1 (Senator Ellis) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {983025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {483226/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |