House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (40-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {833927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |