Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1206 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/15/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 409 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 409 
(House Bill 1206) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission – Establishment 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Maryland –Ireland Trade Commission in the 
Department of Commerce to study and make recommendations regarding certain 
trade relations between Maryland and Ireland; and generally relating to the 
Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission. 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Economic Development 
 Section 5–2501 through 5–2504 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 25. 
 Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission” 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2018 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 
Preamble 
 
 WHEREAS, Over 9% of Maryland’s population is of Irish descent; and 
 
 WHEREAS, The ties that bind Ireland to Maryland are deep and lasting; and 
 
 WHEREAS, Irish heritage has been the fortunate lot of many great Marylanders; 
and 
 
 WHEREAS, Ireland and Maryland are attempting to reinvent their economies for 
success in the twenty–first century; and 
 
 WHEREAS, Marylanders have both historic and practical reasons to desire the 
building of firmer commercial links with Ireland; now, therefore, 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Economic Development 
 
SUBTITLE 25. MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION. 
 
5–2501. 
 
 IN THIS SUBTITLE, “COMMISSION” MEANS THE MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE 
COMMISSION.  Ch. 409 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
 
5–2502. 
 
 (A) THERE IS A MARYLAND–IRELAND TRADE COMMISSION IN THE 
DEPARTMENT . 
 
 (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE COMMISSION IS TO STUD Y AND PROMOTE TRADE 
BETWEEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND. 
 
5–2503. 
 
 (A) THE COMMISSION CONSISTS O F THE FOLLOWING MEMB ERS: 
 
 (1) THE SECRETARY, OR THE SECRETARY’S DESIGNEE; 
 
 (2) THE SECRETARY OF STATE, OR THE SECRETARY OF STATE’S 
DESIGNEE; 
 
 (3) TWO MEMBERS OF THE SENATE OF MARYLAND, APPOINTED BY 
THE PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE, WHO HAVE KNOWLEDGE O F ORGANIZATIONS THAT 
PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR CURRENT OR PAST I NVOLVEMENT IN ORGANI ZATIONS 
THAT PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR HAVE AN INTEREST IN TH E WELL–BEING OF 
TRADE RELATIONS BETW EEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 
 
 (4) TWO MEMBERS OF THE HOUSE OF DELEGATES, APPOINTED BY 
THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE, WHO HAVE KNOWLEDGE O F ORGANIZATIONS THAT 
PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR CURRENT OR PAST I NVOLVEMENT IN ORGANIZATIO NS 
THAT PROMOTE IRISH AFFAIRS, OR HAVE AN INTEREST IN THE WELL–BEING OF 
TRADE RELATIONS BETW EEN MARYLAND AND IRELAND; AND 
 
 (5) THE FOLLOWING MEMBER S, APPOINTED BY THE GOVERNOR, 
WITH THE ADVICE AND CONSENT OF THE SENATE: 
 
 (I) ONE REPRESENTATIVE OF A PUBLIC INSTITUTION O F 
HIGHER EDUCATION ; 
 
 (II) ONE REPRESENTATIVE O F THE MARYLAND CHAMBER OF 
COMMERCE OR ITS SUCCE SSOR ORGANIZATION ; AND 
 
 (III) TWO REPRESENTATIVES OF THE IRISH–AMERICAN 
COMMUNITY , WHO MAY NOT BE OF TH E SAME POLITIC AL PARTY. 
 
 (B) THE CHAIR AND VICE CH AIR OF THE COMMISSION SHALL BE E LECTED 
FROM AMONG THE MEMBE RS OF THE COMMISSION.   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 409 
 
– 3 – 
 
 (C) A MEMBER OF THE BOARD: 
 
 (1) MAY NOT RECEIVE COMP ENSATION AS A MEMBER OF THE BOARD; 
BUT 
 
 (2) IS ENTITLED TO REIMB URSEMENT FOR EXPENSES UNDER THE 
STANDARD STATE TRAVEL REGULATIONS, AS PROVIDED IN THE STATE BUDGET . 
 
 (D) (1) THE TERM OF AN APPOIN TED MEMBER IS 4 YEARS. 
 
 (2) THE TERMS OF THE APPO INTED MEMBERS ARE ST AGGERED AS 
REQUIRED BY THE TERM S PROVIDED FOR MEMBE RS ON OCTOBER 1, 2024. 
 
 (3) AT THE END OF A TERM , A MEMBER CONTINUES T O SERVE UNTIL 
A SUCCESSOR IS APPOI NTED AND QUALIFIES . 
 
 (4) A MEMBER WHO IS APPOIN TED AFTER A TERM HAS BEGUN SERVES 
ONLY FOR THE REST OF THE TERM UNTIL A SUC CESSOR IS APPOINTED AND 
QUALIFIES. 
 
 (5) THE GOVERNOR MAY REMOVE A N APPOINTED MEMBER F OR 
INCOMPETENCE , MISCONDUCT , OR FAILURE TO PERFOR M THE DUTIES OF THE 
POSITION. 
 
5–2504. 
 
 (A) THE COMMISSION SHALL STUD Y AND MAKE RECOMMEND ATIONS 
REGARDING: 
 
 (1) ADVANCING BILATERAL TRADE AND INVESTMENT BETWEEN 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 
 
 (2) INITIATING JOINT ACT ION ON POLICY ISSUES OF MUTUAL 
INTEREST TO MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 
 
 (3) PROMOTING BUSINESS A ND ACADEMIC EXCHANGE S BETWEEN 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 
 
 (4) ENCOURAGING MUTUAL E	CONOMIC SUPPORT BETW	EEN 
MARYLAND AND IRELAND; 
 
 (5) ENCOURAGING MUTUAL I NVESTMENT IN THE INF RASTRUCTURE 
OF MARYLAND AND IRELAND; AND  Ch. 409 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (6) OTHER ISSUES AS DETE RMINED BY THE COMMISSION. 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, AND EACH DECEMBER 1 
THEREAFTER , THE COMMISSION SHALL REPO RT ITS FINDINGS AND 
RECOMMENDATIONS TO T HE GOVERNOR AND , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF 
THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 
 
 (a) All initial appointments to the Maryland–Ireland Trade Commission shall be 
made not later than February 1, 2025. 
 
 (b) The terms of the initial appointed members of the Maryland–Ireland Trade 
Commission shall expire as follows: 
 
 (1) two members in 2025; and 
 
 (2) two members in 2026. 
 
 SECTION 3. 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of September 
30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 9, 2024.