House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {863127/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |