House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Floor Amendment {813025/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {863123/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |