LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1267
Action History
MD
Maryland House Bill HB1267
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2024 Regular Session
Maryland House Bill HB1267
Action History
Senate
03/18/2024
Referred Judicial Proceedings
House
03/16/2024
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
House
03/14/2024
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
House
03/14/2024
Favorable Report by Judiciary
House
02/10/2024
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House
02/08/2024
First Reading Judiciary