House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {873622/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |