House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163425/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |