Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1293 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/23/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 813 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 813 
(House Bill 1293) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Maryland Department of Health – Public Education Campaign on Prostate, 
Lung, and Breast Cancer Prevention 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop and 
implement a public education campaign on prostate, lung, and breast cancer 
prevention that targets communities disproportionately impacted by prostate, lung, 
and breast cancer; and generally relating to the public education campaign on 
prostate, lung, and breast cancer prevention. 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Health – General 
Section 13–11A–01 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 11A. Public Education 
Campaign on Prostate, Lung, and Breast Cancer Prevention” 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 
Section 7–317(a) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 
Section 7–317(f) and (g)(3) 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Health – General 
 
SUBTITLE 11A. PUBLIC EDUCATION CAMPAIGN ON PROSTATE, LUNG, AND 
BREAST CANCER PREVENTION. 
 
13–11A–01. 
 
 (A) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL DEVE LOP AND IMPLEMENT A 3–YEAR PUBLIC 
EDUCATION CAMPAIGN O N PROSTATE, LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER PR EVENTION  Ch. 813 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
THAT TARGETS COMMUNI TIES DISPROPORTIONAT ELY IMPACTED BY PROS TATE, 
LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER . 
 
 (B) IN DEVELOPING THE PUB	LIC EDUCATIO N CAMPAIGN , THE 
DEPARTMENT SHALL WORK WITH: 
 
 (1) HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS , INCLUDING LICENSED P HYSICIANS, 
WHO TREAT INDIVIDUAL S IMPACTED BY PROSTA TE, LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER ; 
 
 (2) HOSPITALS; AND 
 
 (3) HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATI ONS THAT FOCUS ON PR OSTATE, LUNG, 
AND BREAST CANCER .  
 
 (C) THE PUBLIC EDUCATION CAMPAIGN SHALL : 
 
 (1) PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL I NFORMATION ON PROSTA TE, LUNG, AND 
BREAST CANCER , INCLUDING INFORMATIO N REGARDING :  
 
 (I) THE RISKS AND WARNING SIGNS OF PROSTATE , LUNG, AND 
BREAST CANCER ; AND 
 
 (II) GUIDELINES AND BEST P RACTICES TO PREVENT PROSTATE, 
LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER ; 
 
 (2) PROMOTE: 
 
 (I) PARTICIPATION IN CLIN ICAL TRIALS AND STUD IES FOR 
PROSTATE, LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER ; AND 
 
 (II) SCREENINGS SCREENINGS FOR PROSTATE , LUNG, AND 
BREAST CANCER; AND 
 
 (3) PROVIDE INFORMATION O N LEGISLATION THAT R EDUCES COST 
BARRIERS TO PREVENTI ON SERVICES FOR PROS TATE, LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER . 
 
 (D) TO IMPLEMENT THE PUBL IC EDUCATION CAMPAIG N, THE DEPARTMENT 
SHALL: 
 
 (1) USE COMMUNICATIONS TO OLS AND MESSAGING; 
 
 (2) POST ALL MATERIALS ON THE DEPARTMENT ’S WEBSITE IN A 
CONSPICUOUS MANNER A ND AN ACCESSIBLE FOR MAT; AND 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 813 
 
– 3 – 
 (3) DEVELOP PARTNERSHIPS WITH HEALTH AGENCIES , NONPROFIT 
ORGANIZATIONS , AND PRIVATE ENTITIES THAT WORK WITH COMMU NITIES 
DISPROPORTIONA TELY IMPACTED BY PRO STATE, LUNG, AND BREAST CANCER . 
 
 (E) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 
 
 (1) DEVELOP THE PUBLIC ED UCATION CAMPAIGN ON OR BEFORE 
DECEMBER 1, 2025 2026; 
 
 (2) PROVIDE 30 DAYS FOR FEEDBACK AN D COMMENTS FROM THE 
PUBLIC ON THE PUBLIC EDUCATION CAMPAI GN; 
 
 (3) (2) IMPLEMENT THE PUBLIC EDUCATION CAMPAIGN O N OR 
BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2026 2027; AND 
 
 (4) (3) SET MEASURABLE GOALS FOR THE PUBLIC EDUCA TION 
CAMPAIGN.  
 
 (F) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2027, 2028, AND 2029, THE DEPARTMENT 
SHALL SUBMIT A REPOR T ON THE STATUS OF MEETIN G ITS GOALS ESTABLIS HED 
UNDER SUBSECTION (E)(4) OF THIS SECTION TO T HE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. 
 
 (G) (F) (1) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YE ARS 2026, 2027, 2028, AND 2029, 
AND 2030, THE GOVERNOR SHALL INCLUD E IN THE ANNUAL BUDG ET BILL AN 
APPROPRIATION TO THE DEPARTMENT FOR THE PU BLIC EDUCATION CAMPA IGN 
FROM THE CIGARETTE RESTITUTION FUND ESTABLISHED UNDE R § 7–317 OF THE 
STATE FINANCE AND PROCUREMENT ARTICLE. 
 
 (2) THE TOTAL APPROPRIA TION FOR FISCAL YEAR S 2025 2026 
THROUGH 2029 2030 SHALL BE NOT MORE TH AN $2,000,000 $750,000. 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 
 
7–317. 
 
 (a) There is a Cigarette Restitution Fund. 
 
 (f) (1) The Cigarette Restitution Fund shall be used to fund: 
 
 (i) the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program established 
under Title 13, Subtitle 10 of the Health – General Article; 
 
 (ii) the Cancer Prevention, Education, Screening, and Treatment 
Program established under Title 13, Subtitle 11 of the Health – General Article;  Ch. 813 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (iii) the activities of the Southern Maryland Agricultural 
Development Commission, in accordance with § 13–611 of the Economic Development 
Article; 
 
 (iv) For each of fiscal years 2025 through 2029, the Maryland 
Community Health Resources Commission Fund, in accordance with subsection (g) of this 
section; [and] 
 
 (V) THE PUBLIC EDUCATION CAMPAIGN ON PROSTATE , LUNG, 
AND BREAST CANCER PR EVENTION ESTABLISHED UNDER TITLE 13, SUBTITLE 11A 
OF THE HEALTH – GENERAL ARTICLE; AND 
 
 [(v)] (VI) other programs that serve the following purposes: 
 
 1. reduction of the use of tobacco products by individuals 
under the age of 21 years; 
 
 2. implementation of the Southern Maryland Regional 
Strategy–Action Plan for Agriculture adopted by the Tri–County Council for Southern 
Maryland with an emphasis on alternative crop uses for agricultural land now used for 
growing tobacco; 
 
 3. public and school education campaigns to decrease tobacco 
use with initial emphasis on areas targeted by tobacco manufacturers in marketing and 
promoting cigarette and tobacco products; 
 
 4. smoking cessation programs; 
 
 5. enforcement of the laws regarding tobacco sales; 
 
 6. the purposes of the Maryland Health Care Foundation 
under Title 20, Subtitle 5 of the Health – General Article; 
 
 7. primary health care in rural areas of the State and areas 
targeted by tobacco manufacturers in marketing and promoting cigarette and tobacco 
products; 
 
 8. prevention, treatment, and research concerning cancer, 
heart disease, lung disease, tobacco product use, and tobacco control, including operating 
costs and related capital projects; 
 
 9. substance abuse treatment and prevention programs; and 
 
 10. any other public purpose. 
   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 813 
 
– 5 – 
 (2) The provisions of this subsection may not be construed to affect the 
Governor’s powers with respect to a request for an appropriation in the annual budget bill. 
 
 (g) (3) For each fiscal year for which appropriations are made, at least 50% of 
the appropriations shall be made for those purposes enumerated in subsection (f)(1)(i), (ii), 
and [(v)1] (VI)1 through 9 of this section subject to the requirement of subsection (e)(2) of 
this section.  
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, on or before December 1, 
2027, 2028, and 2029, the Maryland Department of Health shall include in the report 
required under § 7–317(j)(2) of the State Finance and Procurement Article the status of 
meeting its goals established under § 13–11A–01 of the Health – General Article, as enacted 
by Section 1 of this Act.  
 
 SECTION 2. 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 
October 1, 2024 July 1, 2025. It shall remain effective for a period of 5 6 years and, at the 
end of September 30, 2029 June 30, 2031, this Act, with no further action required by the 
General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.  
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2024.