Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-34) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 09/18/2023 | Pre-filed |