EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb0133* HOUSE BILL 133 P1 4lr0433 (PRE–FILED) CF SB 448 By: Delegates Bouchat, Boyce, Hill, Hinebaugh, Lehman, McComas, and Ruth Requested: June 20, 2023 Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 Assigned to: Health and Government Operations Committee Report: Favorable House action: Adopted Read second time: February 6, 2024 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland 2 FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Study African American Civil War 3 Soldiers in Maryland to study the history of the African American soldiers who 4 fought for the Union Army and make certain recommendations regarding a memorial 5 dedicated to African American Civil War soldiers; and generally relating to the 6 Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland. 7 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 That: 9 (a) There is a Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in 10 Maryland. 11 (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 12 (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 13 the Senate; 14 (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 15 House; and 16 (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 17 2 HOUSE BILL 133 (i) one representative from the State Archives; 1 (ii) one representative from the Department of Planning; 2 (iii) one representative from the Governor’s Commission on 3 Maryland Military Monuments; 4 (iv) one representative from the Commission on African American 5 History and Culture; 6 (v) one representative from Preservation Maryland, Inc.; and 7 (vi) one representative from the Heart of the Civil War Heritage 8 Area, Inc. 9 (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Commission. 10 (d) The State Archives shall provide staff for the Commission. 11 (e) A member of the Commission: 12 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 13 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 14 Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 15 (f) The Commission shall: 16 (1) study the history of African American Civil War soldiers who fought for 17 the Union Army in Maryland, including muster rolls, locations of service, and all 18 distinguished honors and recognitions awarded; and 19 (2) make findings and recommendations regarding the funding, design, 20 construction, and location of an appropriate memorial dedicated to the African American 21 Civil War soldiers in Maryland. 22 (g) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission shall report its findings and 23 recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 24 Government Article, the General Assembly. 25 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 26 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 27 Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 28 further force and effect. 29