Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | ||
2 | 2 | ||
3 | 3 | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. | |
4 | 4 | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. | |
5 | - | Underlining indicates amendments to bill. | |
6 | - | Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by | |
7 | - | amendment. | |
8 | 5 | *hb0133* | |
9 | 6 | ||
10 | 7 | HOUSE BILL 133 | |
11 | 8 | P1 4lr0433 | |
12 | - | (PRE–FILED) | |
9 | + | (PRE–FILED) | |
13 | 10 | By: Delegates Bouchat, Boyce, Hill, Hinebaugh, Lehman, McComas, and Ruth | |
14 | 11 | Requested: June 20, 2023 | |
15 | 12 | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 | |
16 | 13 | Assigned to: Health and Government Operations | |
17 | - | Committee Report: Favorable | |
18 | - | House action: Adopted | |
19 | - | Read second time: February 6, 2024 | |
20 | 14 | ||
21 | - | ||
15 | + | A BILL ENTITLED | |
22 | 16 | ||
23 | 17 | AN ACT concerning 1 | |
24 | 18 | ||
25 | 19 | Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland 2 | |
26 | 20 | ||
27 | 21 | FOR the purpose of establishing the Commission to Study African American Civil War 3 | |
28 | 22 | Soldiers in Maryland to study the history of the African American soldiers who 4 | |
29 | 23 | fought for the Union Army and make certain recommendations regarding a memorial 5 | |
30 | 24 | dedicated to African American Civil War soldiers; and generally relating to the 6 | |
31 | 25 | Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland. 7 | |
32 | 26 | ||
33 | 27 | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 8 | |
34 | 28 | That: 9 | |
35 | 29 | ||
36 | 30 | (a) There is a Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in 10 | |
37 | 31 | Maryland. 11 | |
38 | 32 | ||
39 | 33 | (b) The Commission consists of the following members: 12 | |
40 | 34 | ||
41 | 35 | (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 13 | |
42 | 36 | the Senate; 14 | |
43 | 37 | ||
44 | 38 | (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 15 | |
45 | 39 | House; and 16 | |
46 | 40 | ||
47 | 41 | (3) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 17 | |
48 | - | 2 HOUSE BILL 133 | |
42 | + | ||
43 | + | (i) one representative from the State Archives; 18 | |
44 | + | ||
45 | + | (ii) one representative from the Department of Planning; 19 | |
46 | + | ||
47 | + | (iii) one representative from the Governor’s Commission on 20 | |
48 | + | Maryland Military Monuments; 21 2 HOUSE BILL 133 | |
49 | 49 | ||
50 | 50 | ||
51 | - | (i) one representative from the State Archives; 1 | |
52 | 51 | ||
53 | - | (ii) one representative from the Department of Planning; 2 | |
52 | + | (iv) one representative from the Commission on African American 1 | |
53 | + | History and Culture; 2 | |
54 | 54 | ||
55 | - | (iii) one representative from the Governor’s Commission on 3 | |
56 | - | Maryland Military Monuments; 4 | |
55 | + | (v) one representative from Preservation Maryland, Inc.; and 3 | |
57 | 56 | ||
58 | - | ( | |
59 | - | ||
57 | + | (vi) one representative from the Heart of the Civil War Heritage 4 | |
58 | + | Area, Inc. 5 | |
60 | 59 | ||
61 | - | ( | |
60 | + | (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Commission. 6 | |
62 | 61 | ||
63 | - | (vi) one representative from the Heart of the Civil War Heritage 8 | |
64 | - | Area, Inc. 9 | |
62 | + | (d) The State Archives shall provide staff for the Commission. 7 | |
65 | 63 | ||
66 | - | ( | |
64 | + | (e) A member of the Commission: 8 | |
67 | 65 | ||
68 | - | ( | |
66 | + | (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Commission; but 9 | |
69 | 67 | ||
70 | - | (e) A member of the Commission: 12 | |
68 | + | (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 10 | |
69 | + | Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 11 | |
71 | 70 | ||
72 | - | ( | |
71 | + | (f) The Commission shall: 12 | |
73 | 72 | ||
74 | - | (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 14 | |
75 | - | Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 15 | |
73 | + | (1) study the history of African American Civil War soldiers who fought for 13 | |
74 | + | the Union Army in Maryland, including muster rolls, locations of service, and all 14 | |
75 | + | distinguished honors and recognitions awarded; and 15 | |
76 | 76 | ||
77 | - | (f) The Commission shall: 16 | |
77 | + | (2) make findings and recommendations regarding the funding, design, 16 | |
78 | + | construction, and location of an appropriate memorial dedicated to the African American 17 | |
79 | + | Civil War soldiers in Maryland. 18 | |
78 | 80 | ||
79 | - | ( | |
80 | - | the | |
81 | - | ||
81 | + | (g) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission shall report its findings and 19 | |
82 | + | recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 20 | |
83 | + | Government Article, the General Assembly. 21 | |
82 | 84 | ||
83 | - | (2) make findings and recommendations regarding the funding, design, 20 | |
84 | - | construction, and location of an appropriate memorial dedicated to the African American 21 | |
85 | - | Civil War soldiers in Maryland. 22 | |
86 | - | ||
87 | - | (g) On or before December 1, 2024, the Commission shall report its findings and 23 | |
88 | - | recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2 –1257 of the State 24 | |
89 | - | Government Article, the General Assembly. 25 | |
90 | - | ||
91 | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 26 | |
92 | - | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 27 | |
93 | - | Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 28 | |
94 | - | further force and effect. 29 | |
85 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 22 | |
86 | + | 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of June 30, 2025, this 23 | |
87 | + | Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no 24 | |
88 | + | further force and effect. 25 | |
95 | 89 |