Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1332 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/14/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1332*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1332 
E5   	4lr3151 
    	CF SB 860 
By: Delegates Valentine, Baker, Buckel, Hinebaugh, Tomlinson, and Wivell 
Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 
Assigned to: Judiciary 
Committee Report: Favorable 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 3, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services – Study on Location of 2 
Individuals Prior to and Following Incarceration 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services 4 
to conduct a certain study examining certain data regarding an individual’s 5 
residence prior to incarceration and on release from a State correctional facility; and 6 
generally relating to State correctional facilities.  7 
 
BY adding to 8 
 Article – Correctional Services 9 
Section 9–618 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Correctional Services 15 
 
9–618. 16 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2025, AND EACH OCTOBER 1 THEREAFTER , 17 
THE DEPARTMENT SHALL COND UCT A STUDY ON THE L OCATION OF INDIVIDUA LS 18 
BEFORE AND FOLL OWING INCARCERATION IN A STATE CORRECTIONAL FA CILITY 19  2 	HOUSE BILL 1332  
 
 
AND REPORT THE RESUL TS OF THE STUDY TO T HE SENATE JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS 1 
COMMITTEE, THE SENATE BUDGET AND TAXATION COMMITTEE, THE HOUSE 2 
JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, AND THE HOUSE APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE, IN 3 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE.  4 
 
 (B) THE STUDY SHALL INCLU DE:  5 
 
 (1) DATA ON THE COUNTY O F RESIDENCE OF EACH INDIVIDUAL 6 
RELEASED DURING THE PREVIOUS YEAR , AS REPORTED BY THE I NDIVIDUAL ON 7 
INTAKE TO THE FACILI TY; 8 
 
 (2) DATA ON THE COUNTY OF RELEASE FO LLOWING INCARCERATIO N; 9 
 
 (3) FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO WERE TRANSFERRED FRO M ONE STATE 10 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y TO ANOTHER PRIOR T O RELEASE, THE NUMBER OF DAYS 11 
THAT THE TRANSFER OC CURRED BEFORE RELEAS E; AND 12 
 
 (4) A COMPARISON OF : 13 
 
 (I) THE NUMBER OF INDIVIDUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 14 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE SAME COUN TY IN WHICH THEY RES IDED PRIOR 15 
TO INCARCERATION ; 16 
 
 (II) THE NUMBER OF INDIVI DUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 17 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE SAME COUN TY IN WHICH CONVICTI ON 18 
OCCURRED; AND 19 
 
 (III) THE NUMBER OF INDIVI DUALS RELEASED FROM A STATE 20 
CORRECTIONAL FACILIT Y INTO THE COUNTY IN WHICH THEY WERE INCA RCERATED 21 
AT THE TIME OF RELEA SE. 22 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 23 
October 1, 2024. 24 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.