House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |