EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *hb1373* HOUSE BILL 1373 F3 4lr2568 By: Delegate Fisher Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 Assigned to: Ways and Means A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Calvert County Public Schools – Extracurricular Activities for Homeschooled 2 Students – Pilot Program and Workgroup 3 FOR the purpose of establishing the Extracurricular Activities for Homeschooled Students 4 Pilot Program in Calvert County to allow homeschooled students to participate in 5 extracurricular activities sponsored by public schools in the county; establishing the 6 Workgroup to Study Access to Extracurricular Activities in Calvert County Public 7 Schools for Homeschooled Students; and generally relating to the Extracurricular 8 Activities for Homeschooled Students Pilot Program and the Workgroup to Study 9 Access to Extracurricular Activities in Calvert County Public Schools for 10 Homeschooled Students. 11 BY adding to 12 Article – Education 13 Section 4–142 14 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 Article – Education 19 4–142. 20 (A) (1) IN THIS SECTION THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 21 INDICATED. 22 (2) “EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITY” INCLUDES INTERSCHOLA STIC 23 ATHLETICS, MUSIC, DRAMA PROGRAMS , STUDENT ORGANIZATION S, AND OTHER 24 2 HOUSE BILL 1373 PROGRAMS SPONSORED B Y A SCHOOL: 1 (I) IN WHICH A STUDENT MA Y PARTICIPATE OUTS IDE REGULAR 2 SCHOOL HOURS ; AND 3 (II) FOR WHICH A STUDENT D OES NOT EARN ACADEMI C CREDIT. 4 (3) “PILOT PROGRAM” MEANS THE EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES 5 FOR HOMESCHOOLED STUDENTS PILOT PROGRAM. 6 (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES ONLY IN CALVERT COUNTY. 7 (C) (1) THERE IS AN EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES FOR 8 HOMESCHOOLED STUDENTS PILOT PROGRAM. 9 (2) THE PURPOSE OF THE PILOT PROGRAM IS TO ALLOW A STUDENT 10 WHO PARTICIPATES IN A HO ME INSTRUCTION PROGR AM IN CALVERT COUNTY TO 11 PARTICIPATE IN AN EX TRACURRICULAR ACTIVI TY SPONSORED BY A PUBLIC SCHOOL 12 IN THE COUNTY. 13 (D) (1) CALVERT COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOLS SHALL ADMINISTER THE 14 PILOT PROGRAM . 15 (2) THE PILOT PROGRAM SHA LL BEGIN IN THE 2025–2026 SCHOOL 16 YEAR AND LAST FOR 3 YEARS. 17 (E) (1) THE COUNTY BOARD SHALL SELECT UP TO FIVE PUBLIC SCHOOLS 18 IN THE COUNTY TO PARTICIPATE IN THE PILOT PROGRAM . 19 (2) EACH PUBLIC SCHOOL IN THE PILOT PROGRAM SHALL ALLOW A 20 STUDENT WHO IS NOT E NROLLED IN THE SCHOO L TO PARTICIPATE IN ANY 21 EXTRACURRICULAR ACTI VITY SPONSORED BY TH E SCHOOL TO THE SAME EXTENT 22 THAT A STUDENT WHO I S ENROLLED IN THE SC HOOL MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE 23 EXTRACURRICULAR ACTI VITY IF THE STUDENT WHO IS NOT ENROLLED : 24 (I) PARTICIPATES IN A HOM E INSTRUCTION PROGRA M UNDER 25 WRITTEN AGREEMENT WIT H THE COUNTY SUPERIN TENDENT; 26 (II) IS ELIGIBLE TO ATTEND THE PUBLIC SCHOOL SPONSORING 27 THE EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITY; AND 28 (III) MEETS AND COMPLIES WI TH THE PUBLIC SCHOOL ’S 29 REQUIREMENTS FOR PAR TICIPATING IN THE EX TRACURRICULAR ACTIV ITY. 30 HOUSE BILL 1373 3 (F) THE COUNTY SCHOOL SYSTEM SHALL: 1 (1) (I) ESTABLISH A POLICY AN D GUIDELINES FOR THE 2 IMPLEMENTATION OF THE PILOT PROGRAM; AND 3 (II) DISTRIBUTE COPIES OF THE POLICY AND GUIDE LINES TO 4 EACH PUBLIC SCHOOL PARTICIPATING IN THE PILOT PROGRAM ; AND 5 (2) COLLECT DATA FROM EACH PUBLIC SCH OOL PARTICIPATING IN 6 THE PILOT PROGRAM ON THE FOLLOWING ISS UES: 7 (I) ADMINISTRATIVE REQUIR EMENTS, INCLUDING PUBLIC 8 NOTICE, STAFF RESOURCES , TECHNOLOGY , PHYSICAL SPACE , AND LEGAL 9 LIABILITIES; 10 (II) COSTS OF OPERATING THE PILOT PROGRAM; 11 (III) STUDENT PROGRAM ELIGI BILITY REQUIREMENTS , 12 INCLUDING ACADEMIC , HEALTH, AND BEHAVIORAL MANDA TES ACROSS ALL TYPES 13 OF EXTRACURRICULAR A CTIVITIES OFFERED ; 14 (IV) IDENTIFYING AND PROVI DING EDUCATIONAL 15 ACCOMMODATIONS FOR NONENROLLED STUDENTS ; 16 (V) TRANSPORTATION OF NON ENROLLED STUDENTS , 17 INCLUDING COSTS , MANDATES, AND LEGAL LIABILITY ; AND 18 (VI) STUDENT PROGRAM ENROL LMENT LIMITS. 19 (G) ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2026, THROUGH 2029, THE COUNTY 20 SUPERINTENDENT SHALL REPORT TO THE CALVERT COUNTY BOARD OF 21 EDUCATION AND , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT 22 ARTICLE, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY REGARDING TH E EFFECTIVENESS OF T HE 23 PILOT PROGRAM , INCLUDING: 24 (1) THE NUMBER OF HOMESCH OOLED STUDENTS PARTI CIPATING IN 25 THE PILOT PROGRAM FROM EACH PARTICIPAT ING PUBLIC SCHOOL ; 26 (2) INFORMATION COLLECTED BY THE COUNTY SCHOOL SYSTEM 27 UNDER SUBSECTION (F)(2) OF THIS SECTION; 28 (3) FEEDBACK FROM THE FOL LOWING GROUPS WHO PARTICIPATED 29 4 HOUSE BILL 1373 IN THE PILOT PROGRAM : 1 (I) HOMESCHOOLED STUDENTS AND THEIR P ARENTS OR 2 GUARDIANS; 3 (II) PUBLIC SCHOOL STUDENT S AND THEIR PARENTS OR 4 GUARDIANS AT PARTICI PATING SCHOOLS ; AND 5 (III) SCHOOL PERSONNEL AT P ARTICIPATING SCHOOLS ; AND 6 (4) RECOMMENDATIONS TO EX PAND OR DISCONTINUE THE PILOT 7 PROGRAM. 8 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That : 9 (a) There is a Workgroup to Study Access to Extracurricular Activities in Calvert 10 County Public Schools for Homeschooled Students. 11 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 12 (1) the Superintendent of Calvert County Schools; 13 (2) one member of the Board of Calvert County Commissioners, appointed 14 by the Chair of the Board of Calvert County Commissioners; 15 (3) one member of the Calvert County Board of Education, appointed by 16 the Chair of the Calvert County Board of Education; and 17 (4) two parents of homeschooled students who reside in Calvert County, 18 designated by the Maryland Homeschool Association. 19 (c) The Workgroup members shall elect the chair of the Workgroup from among 20 its appointed members. 21 (d) The Calvert County Board of Education shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 22 (e) A member of the Workgroup: 23 (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Workgroup; but 24 (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 25 Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 26 (f) The Workgroup shall: 27 HOUSE BILL 1373 5 (1) study the following issues regarding homeschooled student 1 participation in extracurricular activities sponsored by public schools in the county: 2 (i) administrative requirements, including public notice, staff 3 resources, technology, physical space, and legal liabilities; 4 (ii) costs of providing services not covered by State and local funding; 5 (iii) student program eligibility requirements, including academic, 6 health, and behavioral mandates across all types of extracurricular activities offered; 7 (iv) identifying and providing educational accommodations for 8 nonenrolled students; 9 (v) transportation of nonenrolled students, including costs, 10 mandates, and legal liability; and 11 (vi) student program enrollment limits; 12 (2) study and evaluate data from other states or jurisdictions, if any, that 13 allow homeschooled students or other nonenrolled students to parti cipate in 14 extracurricular activities sponsored by a public school; and 15 (3) make recommendations as to the administrative, financial, and 16 logistical feasibility of homeschooled student participation in extracurricular activities 17 sponsored by public schools in Calvert County. 18 (g) On or before December 31, 2024, the Workgroup shall report its findings and 19 recommendations to the Board of Calvert County Commissioners, the Calvert County 20 Board of Education, and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 21 members of the Calvert County Delegation to the General Assembly. 22 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 23 1, 2024. Section 2 of this Act shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and, at the end of 24 June 30, 2025, Section 2 of this Act, with no further action required by the General 25 Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. Section 1 of this Act shall 26 remain effective for a period of 6 years and, at the end of June 30, 2030, this Act, with no 27 further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and of no further force 28 and effect. 29