House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1041 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {993027/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |