1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *hb1379* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | HOUSE BILL 1379 |
---|
8 | 8 | | M5, P2 4lr2959 |
---|
9 | 9 | | CF SB 935 |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Delegates Adams and Arentz |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2024 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Economic Matters |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Department of General Services – Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program – 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Establishment 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of General Services, in consultation with the 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | University System of Maryland and the Department of the Environment, to establish 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | a Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program in the Department on or before a certain 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | date; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Commission, to issue a 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | certain solicitation for a renewable natural gas contract; authorizing the Department 8 |
---|
26 | 26 | | to enter into a contract to procure renewable natural gas; requiring the Department 9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | to collect certain data, require the completion of certain lifecycle analyses, and 10 |
---|
28 | 28 | | analyze certain environmental and economic costs and benefits; and generally 11 |
---|
29 | 29 | | relating to the Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program. 12 |
---|
30 | 30 | | |
---|
31 | 31 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 13 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Article – Public Utilities 14 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Section 7–704.4(a)(1) and (3) 15 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 16 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 17 |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | BY adding to 18 |
---|
38 | 38 | | Article – State Finance and Procurement 19 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Section 4–325 and 4–326 to be under the new part “Part IV. State Purchase of 20 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Energy” 21 |
---|
41 | 41 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 22 |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 23 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 24 |
---|
45 | 45 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 25 |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | Article – Public Utilities 26 |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2 HOUSE BILL 1379 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | 7–704.4. 1 |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | (3) “Social cost of greenhouse gases” means the most recent social cost of 3 |
---|
56 | 56 | | greenhouse gases adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. 4 |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | Article – State Finance and Procurement 5 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | 4–323. RESERVED. 6 |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | 4–324. RESERVED. 7 |
---|
63 | 63 | | |
---|
64 | 64 | | PART IV. STATE PURCHASE OF ENERGY. 8 |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | 4–325. 9 |
---|
67 | 67 | | |
---|
68 | 68 | | (A) IN THIS PART THE FOLL OWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 10 |
---|
69 | 69 | | INDICATED. 11 |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | (B) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS PILOT PROGRAM. 12 |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) “SOCIAL COST OF GREENH OUSE GASES” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 13 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 7–704.4 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 14 |
---|
75 | 75 | | |
---|
76 | 76 | | 4–326. 15 |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | (A) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT , IN 16 |
---|
79 | 79 | | CONSULTATI ON WITH THE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM OF MARYLAND AND THE 17 |
---|
80 | 80 | | DEPARTMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT , SHALL ESTABLISH A RENEWABLE NATURAL 18 |
---|
81 | 81 | | GAS PILOT PROGRAM IN THE DEPARTMENT . 19 |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROCURE RENEWABLE NATURAL 20 |
---|
84 | 84 | | GAS FOR USE AS A FUE L IN THE STATE’S TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING SECTORS 21 |
---|
85 | 85 | | TO EVALUATE THE ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECONOMIC BENEFITS AN D COSTS OF 22 |
---|
86 | 86 | | REPLACING FOSSIL NAT URAL GAS WITH RENEWA BLE NATURAL GAS , ON A 23 |
---|
87 | 87 | | SHORT–TERM AND LONG –TERM BASIS, IN FURTHERANCE OF TH E STATE’S NET–ZERO 24 |
---|
88 | 88 | | STATEWIDE GREENHOUSE GAS EMISSIONS REDUCT ION GOALS. 25 |
---|
89 | 89 | | |
---|
90 | 90 | | (C) (1) UNDER THE PROGRAM, THE DEPARTMENT , IN CONSULTATION 26 |
---|
91 | 91 | | WITH THE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM OF MARYLAND AND THE DEPARTMENT OF THE 27 |
---|
92 | 92 | | ENVIRONMENT : 28 |
---|
93 | 93 | | HOUSE BILL 1379 3 |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | (I) SHALL ISSUE A COMPET ITIVE SEALED PROCURE MENT 1 |
---|
97 | 97 | | SOLICITATION FOR REN EWABLE NATUR AL GAS; AND 2 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | (II) MAY ENTER INTO AT LE AST ONE CONTRACT TO PROCURE 3 |
---|
100 | 100 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S. 4 |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | (2) WHEN ISSUING THE INVI TATION FOR BIDS UNDE R THIS 5 |
---|
103 | 103 | | SUBSECTION, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION : 6 |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | (I) THE COST –EFFECTIVENESS OF THE ADOPTION OF 7 |
---|
106 | 106 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S; 8 |
---|
107 | 107 | | |
---|
108 | 108 | | (II) THE SOCIAL COST OF G REENHOUSE GASES ; AND 9 |
---|
109 | 109 | | |
---|
110 | 110 | | (III) THE STATE’S CLIMATE COMMITMENT S UNDER § 2–1204.2 10 |
---|
111 | 111 | | OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE. 11 |
---|
112 | 112 | | |
---|
113 | 113 | | (3) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 12 |
---|
114 | 114 | | PARAGRAPH , RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED THROUGH A CONTR ACT UNDER 13 |
---|
115 | 115 | | PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL BE GENERATED IN THE STATE. 14 |
---|
116 | 116 | | |
---|
117 | 117 | | (II) IF SUFFICIENT RENEWAB LE NATURAL GAS GENER ATED IN 15 |
---|
118 | 118 | | THE STATE IS NOT REASONAB LY AVAILABLE FOR THE PROGRAM, THE STATE MAY 16 |
---|
119 | 119 | | PROCURE RENEWABLE NA TURAL GAS FRO M SOURCES OUTSIDE TH E STATE. 17 |
---|
120 | 120 | | |
---|
121 | 121 | | (D) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 18 |
---|
122 | 122 | | |
---|
123 | 123 | | (1) COLLECT GREENHOUSE G AS EMISSIONS REDUCTI ON DATA THAT 19 |
---|
124 | 124 | | DETERMINES WHETHER R ENEWABLE NATURAL GAS MAY SUPPORT THE STATE’S 20 |
---|
125 | 125 | | CLIMATE COMMITMENTS UNDER § 2–1204.2 OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE; 21 |
---|
126 | 126 | | |
---|
127 | 127 | | (2) REQUIRE THE GENERATOR OR OTHER APPROPRIATE ENTITY OF 22 |
---|
128 | 128 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED UNDER THE PROGRAM TO COMPLETE A 23 |
---|
129 | 129 | | CARBON LIFECYCLE ANA LYSIS THROUGH AN IND EPENDENT, THIRD–PARTY 24 |
---|
130 | 130 | | CONTRACTOR ; AND 25 |
---|
131 | 131 | | |
---|
132 | 132 | | (3) ANALYZE THE ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECONOMIC BENEFITS AN D 26 |
---|
133 | 133 | | COSTS OF EXPANDING THE USE OF RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS IN THE 27 |
---|
134 | 134 | | TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING SECTORS IN T HE STATE. 28 |
---|
135 | 135 | | |
---|
136 | 136 | | (E) THE PROGRAM SHALL TERMINA TE ON DECEMBER 31, 2027. 29 |
---|
137 | 137 | | |
---|
138 | 138 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 30 |
---|
139 | 139 | | October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 3 years and 9 months and, at the 31 4 HOUSE BILL 1379 |
---|
140 | 140 | | |
---|
141 | 141 | | |
---|
142 | 142 | | end of June 30, 2028, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 1 |
---|
143 | 143 | | shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 2 |
---|