Senate | 03/22/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (105-36) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513125/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reassigned to Economic Matters Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |