House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (104-30) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (32-10) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator M. Washington) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {463321/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (103-38) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {173321/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |