House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {753129/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Waldstreicher, West and Charles)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Holmes, Foley and Nawrocki)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {703327/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {443027/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
First Reading Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|