House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (122-15)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {463720/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (128-12)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {743023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m. (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
|
|
|