House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (41-3) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (105-32) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {953723/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/09/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |