House
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Floor Amendment {543427/1 (Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {933321/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (136-5)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Committee Amendment {573821/1 Withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Korman) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Floor Committee Amendment {253828/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Boyce) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {573821/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2024
|
Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|