Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1511 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb1511*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1511 
M1   	4lr3538 
      
By: Delegate Love 
Introduced and read first time: February 22, 2024 
Assigned to: Rules and Executive Nominations 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Forest Conservation Act – Modifications 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Natural Resources to update a certain 3 
model local government ordinance and adopt certain regulations relating to forest 4 
conservation on or before certain dates; delaying the dates on which certain 5 
provisions of the Forest Conservation Act will apply to certain solarvoltaic facilities 6 
and forest conservation plans; delaying the effective date of certain provisions of the 7 
Forest Conservation Act; and generally relating to the Forest Conservation Act. 8 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 9 
 Chapter 541 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023 10 
Section 5, 9, and 10 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 
 Chapter 542 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2023 13 
 Section 5, 9, and 10 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
Chapter 541 of the Acts of 2023 17 
 
 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 18 
 
 (a)  The Department of Natural Resources shall update the State Forest 19 
Conservation Technical Manual on or before December 31, 2024, for consistency with this 20 
Act. 21 
 
 (b)  The updates shall include: 22 
 
 (1)  guidance on: 23  2 	HOUSE BILL 1511  
 
 
 
 (i)  when the clearing of a priority area for retention described in § 1 
5–1607(c) of the Natural Resources Article, as enacted by this Act, may be justified, 2 
including for purposes related to forest health or composition; and 3 
 
 (ii)  the use of site design practices to minimize clearing; and 4 
 
 (2)  standards by which credit may be granted for the restoration of 5 
degraded forest. 6 
 
 (C) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 7 
RESOURCES SHALL UPDATE THE MODEL LOCAL GOVERNMENT ORDINANCE 8 
REQUIRED UNDER § 5–1609 OF THE NATURAL RESOURCES ARTICLE FOR 9 
CONSISTENCY WITH THIS ACT. 10 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 11 
RESOURCES SHALL ADOPT REGULATI ONS TO CARRY OUT THE PROVISIONS OF THIS 12 
ACT. 13 
 
 SECTION 9. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act may not apply to: 14 
 
 (1)  a solarvoltaic facility granted a certificate of public convenience and 15 
necessity by the Public Service Commission under § 7–207 of the Public Utilities Article 16 
before July 1, [2023] 2025; 17 
 
 (2)  a forest conservation plan approved before July 1, [2024] 2026, that is 18 
associated with a subdivision plan, site plan, building permit, or grading or sediment 19 
control application; or 20 
 
 (3)  a revision to a plan or permit described in item (2) of this section that 21 
does not materially alter the proposed or actual limits of disturbance. 22 
 
 SECTION 10. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Sections 1, 2, and 3 of this 23 
Act shall take effect July 1, [2024] 2026. 24 
 
Chapter 542 of the Acts of 2023 25 
 
 SECTION 5. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That: 26 
 
 (a)  The Department of Natural Resources shall update the State Forest 27 
Conservation Technical Manual on or before December 31, 2024, for consistency with this 28 
Act. 29 
 
 (b)  The updates shall include: 30 
 
 (1)  guidance on: 31   	HOUSE BILL 1511 	3 
 
 
 
 (i)  when the clearing of a priority area for retention described in § 1 
5–1607(c) of the Natural Resources Article, as enacted by this Act, may be justified, 2 
including for purposes related to forest health or composition; and 3 
 
 (ii)  the use of site design practices to minimize clearing; and 4 
 
 (2)  standards by which credit may be granted for the restoration of 5 
degraded forest. 6 
 
 (C) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 7 
RESOURCES SHALL UPDATE THE MODEL LOCAL GOVERNMENT ORDINANCE 8 
REQUIRED UND ER § 5–1609 OF THE NATURAL RESOURCES ARTICLE FOR 9 
CONSISTENCY WITH THIS ACT. 10 
 
 (D) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL 11 
RESOURCES SHALL ADOPT REGULATI ONS TO CARRY OUT THI S ACT. 12 
 
 SECTION 9. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act may not ap ply to: 13 
 
 (1)  a solarvoltaic facility granted a certificate of public convenience and 14 
necessity by the Public Service Commission under § 7–207 of the Public Utilities Article 15 
before July 1, [2023] 2025; 16 
 
 (2)  a forest conservation plan approved before July 1, [2024] 2026, that is 17 
associated with a subdivision plan, site plan, building permit, or grading or sediment 18 
control application; or 19 
 
 (3)  a revision to a plan or permit described in item (2) of this section that 20 
does not materially alter the proposed or actual limits of disturbance. 21 
 
 SECTION 10. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Sections 1, 2, and 3 of this 22 
Act shall take effect July 1, [2024] 2026. 23 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act sha ll take effect June 24 
1, 2024. 25