House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 972 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {153529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/10/2023 | Pre-filed |