House | 03/04/2024 | Withdrawn by Sponsor | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Pre-filed |