House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {583020/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {453427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 08/15/2023 | Pre-filed |