Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (110-31) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {943127/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Pre-filed |