House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534 | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (108-30) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {263527/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Appropriations | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Pre-filed |